FL S0292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring hospitals and other state-licensed birthing facilities to test for congenital cytomegalovirus in newborns within a specified timeframe under certain circumstances; revising the timeframe in which health care providers attending home births must make certain referrals; requiring a newborn's primary health care provider to refer the newborn for testing for congenital cytomegalovirus under certain circumstances; requiring that certain test results be reported to the Department of Health within a specified timeframe, etc.
Title
Newborn Screenings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#855 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-25 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/19/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-10-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/03/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1073 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 292