FL S0290 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 135
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the application form for motor vehicle registration to include language to indicate an applicant is deaf or hard of hearing; requiring such information to be included in certain databases, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Registration Applications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 135
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted CS/HB 135
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-02-07SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-31SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2018-01-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/24/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-10-24SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2017-10-24SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 10/24/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-09-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H135 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-42

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback