FL S0286 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/01/21, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries Committee
Hearing: Mar 1 @ 4:00 pm in 412 Knott Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "Contractor V" to authorize such fire protection system contractors to design and alter certain systems; revising the definition of the term "fire protection system", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire Sprinklers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/01/21, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-12-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H137 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Added to Commerce Committee agenda
S1408 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-02-28 - Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
633102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback