FL S0286 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Blue Star Collection System Assessment and Maintenance Program and providing its purpose; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to adopt rules and review and approve program applications for certification; requiring the department to allow public and nonprofit utilities to participate in the Clean Water State Revolving Fund Program under certain conditions; authorizing additional recipients and uses of Small Community Sewer Construction Assistance Act grants, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Wastewater Collection System Assessment and Maintenance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H105 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031839Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback