FL S0284 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring district school board policies to list the emergency response agencies that are responsible for notifying the school district of emergencies; authorizing a public school to purchase and maintain a supply of epinephrine auto-injectors; providing that a school district and its employees and agents, including a physician providing a standing protocol for school epinephrine auto-injectors, are not liable for an injury to a student arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector under certain circumstances; requiring the emergency response agencies to notify private schools in the school district of emergencies under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
School Emergencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#339 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Chapter No. 2013-63 | |
2013-05-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 369 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/13 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | CS by- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Now in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/13, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education; Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0369 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 284 (Ch. 2013-63)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |