FL S0282 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from regulation under parts I and II of ch. 494, F.S., for certain securities dealers, investment advisers, and associated persons; providing requirements for certain solicitations and referrals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-09-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S314 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 193
H193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-44
S894 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 935
H935 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-61

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
494001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49400115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback