FL S0278 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 87
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain information received by the Department of State from another state or the District of Columbia which is confidential or exempt pursuant to the laws of that jurisdiction; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of State

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 87
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 87
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 11/07/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-09-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S276 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 85
H87 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-33
H85 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-32

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback