FL S0276 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 85
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of State to become a member of a nongovernmental entity to verify voter registration information; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to provide specified information to the Department of State, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration List Maintenance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 85
2018-02-08SenateSubstituted CS/HB 85
2018-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/08/18
2018-01-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-25SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-12SenateNow in Rules
2017-12-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-06SenateCS by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-11-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-11-07SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 11/07/17, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-09-29SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations; Rules
2017-09-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S278 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 87
H85 (Same As) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-32
H87 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-33

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback