FL S0274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to expunge the nonjudicial arrest record of certain minors who have successfully completed a diversion program for any offense, rather than only a misdemeanor offense; authorizing a minor who successfully completes a diversion program for any offense, rather than only for a first-time misdemeanor offense, to lawfully deny or fail to acknowledge certain information, etc.
Title
Juvenile Diversion Program Expunction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#312 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/07/21 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/01/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/31/21, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/09/21, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/26/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S164 (Similar To) 2020-12-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 885 (Ch. 2021-219)
H93 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to SB 274
H95 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 166
S166 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
H93 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to SB 274
H95 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/SB 166
S166 (Related) 2021-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |