FL S0274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a landlord from evicting a tenant or terminating a residential rental agreement because the tenant is a victim of actual or threatened domestic violence, dating violence, sexual violence, or stalking; authorizing a victim of such actual or threatened violence or stalking to terminate a residential rental agreement without penalty by providing written notice of intent to terminate the agreement and to vacate the premises; specifying that a tenant does not forfeit any deposit money or advance rent paid to the landlord for terminating a rental agreement under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Residential Tenancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/274 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/274/BillText/Filed/HTML |