FL S0272 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a referendum to adopt or amend a local discretionary sales surtax must be held at a general election, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Tax Referenda

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-06SenateNow in Rules
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 7
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 01/16/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-30SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
2017-10-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-24SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2017-10-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 10/24/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations; Rules
2017-09-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H317 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
166211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback