FL S0264 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain dividends or premium refunds must be retained by the association's joint underwriting plan of insurers as surplus, subject to specified diligent search and notification requirements and subject to certain claims by former insureds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Workers' Compensation Joint Underwriting Association

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-13SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-11SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H301 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered enrolled
H537 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback