FL S0260 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 63
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to the seclusion and restraint of students with disabilities; revising school district policies and procedures relating to restraint; requiring continuing education and inservice training for teaching students with emotional or behavioral disabilities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students with Disabilities in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 63
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 63
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Health Policy
2018-02-07SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Education; Health Policy; Rules
2017-09-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H63 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012582Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback