FL S0256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Senator Helen Gordon Davis Fair Pay Protection Act"; prohibiting an employer from providing less favorable employment opportunities to employees based on their sex; prohibiting an employer from taking certain employment actions against employees; prohibiting an employer from engaging in certain activities relating to wages and benefits; prohibiting an employer from requiring employees to sign certain waivers and documents, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in Labor and Employment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2020-12-21SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2020-12-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H107 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1077 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
44807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback