FL S0254 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Defining the term "religious institution"; providing that an emergency order may not directly or indirectly prohibit religious services or activities; providing an exception under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Religious Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22
2022-01-18SenateCS by Rules read 1st time
2022-01-14SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-13SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-01-13SenateCS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-12-01SenateNow in Rules
2021-11-30SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-10-13SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2021-09-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H215 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Added to State Affairs Committee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25264Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Amendment/294268/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Analyses/2022s00254.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Analyses/2022s00254.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Analyses/2022s00254.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Analyses/2022s00254.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Vote/2021-11-30%200330PM~S00254%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/254/Vote/2022-01-13%200900AM~S00254%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback