FL S0254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "religious institution"; providing that an emergency order may not directly or indirectly prohibit religious services or activities; providing an exception under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Religious Institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#648 (Y: 88 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 88, NAYS 29 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 215 |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | In Messages |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 3 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 11/30/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules |
2021-09-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H215 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 254