FL S0254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to limit the number of amendments to the State Constitution that the Legislature may submit to the electorate at the same election to three, etc.
Title
Amendments to the State Constitution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/05/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/254 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0254/BillText/Filed/HTML |