FL S0252 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from the sales and use tax the sale for human utilization of diapers, incontinence undergarments, incontinence pads, or incontinence liners, etc.
Title
Tax Exemption for Diapers and Incontinence Products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/21/17, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0071 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)