FL S0250 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the terms "ambulatory surgical center" and "mobile surgical facility"; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Board of Osteopathic Medicine to adopt rules that establish requirements for practitioners and facilities related to the delivery of surgical care to children in ambulatory surgical centers, in accordance with specified standards, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ambulatory Surgical Centers and Mobile Surgical Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2017-12-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-12-05SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-09-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H23 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback