FL S0248 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a body camera recording is confidential and exempt from public records requirements under certain circumstances; providing exceptions; requiring a law enforcement agency to retain body camera recordings for at least a specified period; providing for retroactive application; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Body Camera Recording Made by a Law Enforcement Officer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#356 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-41
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 2
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-14SenateAmendment(s) adopted (147800, 199882, 870948)
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-07SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2015-04-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-03SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-02SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-23SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-03-19SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-17SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Not Considered
2015-03-03SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-18SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-02-18SenateRemaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-02-18SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2015-02-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-16SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/16/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2015-01-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2015-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0057 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
H0581 (Similar To) 2015-02-20 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2015-41)
S0852 (Similar To) 2015-02-18 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 248 (Ch. 2015-41)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1190714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
784046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
794024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431718Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/248
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/c3/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/252982/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/968344/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/328126/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/864868/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/108082/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/199882/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/147800/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Amendment/870948/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Vote/SenateVote_s0248e1007.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0248/Vote/HouseVote_s0248e1356.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback