FL S0248 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to medical privacy concerning firearms; deleting provisions providing that unless the information is relevant to the patient's medical care or safety, or the safety of others, inquiries regarding firearm ownership or possession should not be made by licensed health care providers or health care facilities, providing that a patient may decline to provide information regarding the ownership or possession of firearms, clarifying that a physician's authority to choose his or her patients is not altered by the act, prohibiting discrimination by licensed health care providers or health care facilities based solely upon a patient's firearm ownership or possession, and prohibiting harassment of a patient regarding firearm ownership during an examination by a licensed health care provider or health care facility, etc.
Title
Privacy of Firearm Owners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 26 | |
2011-09-21 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Health Regulation; Rules -SJ 26 | |
2011-09-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 338 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/248 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0248/BillText/Filed/HTML |