FL S0244 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the blue star collection system assessment and maintenance program; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to adopt rules and review and, if appropriate, approve applications for certification under the program; creating a presumption of compliance with certain total maximum daily load requirements for certified blue star utilities; requiring the department to provide extended operating permits when a certified blue star utility applies for permit renewal under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Wastewater Collection System Assessment and Maintenance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08SenateNow in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
2018-02-07SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2018-02-07SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-05SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 02/05/18, 4:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H837 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S1308 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1149
H1149 (Similar To) 2018-04-06 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4031839Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback