FL S0242 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the term "developmental disability" to include the disorder and symptoms attributable to Duchenne muscular dystrophy, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Developmental Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Banking and Insurance
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-19SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2018-01-17SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-17SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-16SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H969 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
393063Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback