FL S0240 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that concealed weapon and concealed firearm licensees are not prohibited by specified laws from carrying such weapons or firearms on certain private school property, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed Weapons and Firearms on Private School Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-13SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2017-08-31SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H113 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S274 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
790115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback