FL S0236 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exception to the expiration of certain public records and public meetings exemptions under specified circumstances; prohibiting the disclosure of the personal identifying information of an alleged victim of sexual harassment or sexual misconduct, or information that could assist an individual in determining the identity of such alleged victim, in any portion of a proceeding conducted by the Commission on Ethics, a commission on ethics and public trust, or a county or a municipality that has established a local investigatory process which is open to the public; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing statements of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records and Public Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Messages
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-26HouseIn Messages
2019-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-06SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-13SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-02-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/19, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-04SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112324Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2860113Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback