FL S0236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale of certain used passenger or light truck tires by a used tire retailer; designating what constitutes an unsafe used tire; providing that violations of the act are deceptive and unfair trade practices, etc.
Title
Used Tire Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/236 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0236/BillText/Filed/HTML |