FL S0234 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 117
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the list of persons prohibited from disclosing the testimony of a witness examined before, or the evidence received by, a grand jury; creating an exception for a request by the media or an interested person to the prohibited publishing, broadcasting, disclosing, divulging, or communicating of any testimony of a witness examined before the grand jury, or the content, gist, or import thereof; providing criminal penalties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of Grand Jury Testimony

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 117
2024-02-21SenateSubstituted CS/HB 117
2024-02-21SenateRead 2nd time
2024-02-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
2024-02-13SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2024-02-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-02-09SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-02-08SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2024-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-10SenateNow in Rules
2024-01-10SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2024-01-09SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2024-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/10/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-12-14SenateNow in Criminal Justice
2023-12-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2023-12-13SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-12-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/13/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-11-07SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2023-10-19SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H117 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Chapter No. 2024-7

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90527Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Amendment/103388/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.pre.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.ju.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.pre.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.cj.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Analyses/2024s00234.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Vote/2023-12-13%200900AM~S00234%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Vote/2024-01-10%200830AM~S00234%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/234/Vote/2024-02-08%200830AM~S00234%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback