FL S0230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring supervisors of elections to enter into agreements with clerks of the circuit courts to receive specified information; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to furnish monthly to the Department of State a list of persons who identified themselves as aliens; requiring the Department of State to compare the list with the statewide voter registration system and provide the names of registered voters who are aliens to the supervisors of elections of the counties in which the voters are registered, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration Maintenance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations
2019-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H131 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
98065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback