FL S0228 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2021-137)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2021-137)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying that a notary public is entitled to select particular technology in performing a notarial act with respect to an electronic record; modifying requirements for entries in the electronic journal maintained by an online notary public; clarifying that an online notary public is entitled to select his or her remote online notarization service provider; clarifying limitations on fees charged for online notarizations, etc.
Title
Notaries Public
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Jennifer Bradley [R] |
Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 121 (Ch. 2021-137) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 121 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/21 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/25/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/18/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/15/21, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/25/21, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H121 (Same As) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-137
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
117 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |