FL S0228 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the length of time before an election during which the Florida Elections Commission may not make public a probable cause finding and any related proceedings and records; prohibiting the Commission on Ethics from publicly releasing a notification of a probable cause finding, and the documents made and received in disposition of a complaint or referral, during a specified period immediately preceding an election; providing for future legislative review and repeal; providing statements of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Probable Cause Finding
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H439 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/228 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/228/BillText/Filed/HTML |