FL S0228 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring each region of the Department of Children and Families and each community-based care lead agency to establish a plan to recruit providers of specialized services to commercially sexually exploited children and to increase the service capacity of existing providers in order to develop the necessary capacity to meet the needs of ommercially sexually exploited children, etc.
Title
Serving Commercially Sexually Exploited Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/228 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/228/BillText/Filed/HTML |