FL S0226 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the release orientation program to consist of at least 200 hours of instruction time; requiring the Department of Corrections to assist inmates in securing the identified basic support services; requiring the department to notify every inmate of opportunities for industry certifications and job placement in the community in which the inmate will be released, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inmate Reentry Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-10-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 10/09/17, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-08-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7089 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1218 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9447065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9448025Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback