FL S0226 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 958
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a parking enforcement specialist or agency to validate compliance for the disposition of a citation issued for illegally parking in a space provided for people who have disabilities; revising requirements for renewal or replacement of a disabled parking permit; prohibiting applying for a new disabled parking permit for a certain period of time upon a second finding of guilt or plea of nolo contendere to unlawful use of such permit; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to randomly review disabled parking permitholders, verify certain information, and invalidate the permit of a deceased permitholder; directing the department to implement a means for reporting abuse of disabled parking permits, etc.
Title
Disabled Parking Permits
Sponsors
Senate Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] | Sen. Gwen Margolis [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1127 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 958 | |
2012-03-07 | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 -HJ 1160 | |
2012-03-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1160 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1117 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -HJ 1099 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1099 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-14 | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-14 | Read 3rd time -SJ 512 | |
2012-02-13 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-13 | Read 2nd time -SJ 491 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/12 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/01/12, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 01/25/12, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 100 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 25 | |
2011-12-09 | Now in Budget -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-08 | CS by Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-11-28 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations, 12/08/11, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2011-11-02 | Now in Budget -SJ 110 | |
2011-11-01 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 110 | |
2011-10-21 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 11/01/11, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-09-21 | Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 25 | |
2011-09-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |