FL S0218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for all records containing reports of animal cruelty made by veterinarians, veterinary technicians, and other animal treatment provider employees; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Reports of Animal Cruelty
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S216 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture
H49 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H47 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H49 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H47 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/218 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/218/BillText/Filed/HTML |