FL S0216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring each wastewater facility that unlawfully discharges specified volumes of sewage into a waterway or aquifer to notify certain customers by first class mail within a specified timeframe; providing penalties for wastewater treatment facilities that unlawfully discharge a specified volume of sewage into designated areas, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Quality Improvements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-14SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-01-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H141 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S368 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S1758 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H1395 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4030771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback