FL S0216 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides additional responsibilities of the Joint Legislative Sunset Committee for the purpose of reviewing exemptions from the general state sales and use tax and exclusions of sales of services from such taxation. Provides for future elimination of all sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage tax exemptions except those for general groceries, medical, guide dogs for the blind, and household fuels, etc.
Title
Sales Tax/Review of Exemptions and Exclusions [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Withdrawn from Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00024 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0167 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Finance & Tax Council
S0152 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
S0152 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 9035 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 0821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0376 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |