FL S0212 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from entering or being present in this state if he or she has been denied admission, excluded, deported, or removed from the United States unless the United States Attorney General consents to his or her admission or the person can establish that federal law does not require advance consent, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reentry Into the State by Certain Persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2017-08-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H45 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
87728Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback