FL S0212 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2176 (Ch. 2010-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for interpretation of provisions relating to workers' compensation benefits for certain services performed by off-duty deputy sheriffs. Provides conditions under which a law enforcement officer, correctional officer, or correctional probation officer who suffers from a specified medical condition and has materially departed from the prescribed treatment for that condition shall lose a specified presumption for workers' compensation claims, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims/Law Enforcement and Correctional Officers [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2176 (Ch. 2010-175)
2010-04-27 In Messages
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00885; Amendment(s) adopted (845808) -SJ 00886; CS passed as amended (845808); YEAS 37 NAYS 1 -SJ 00886
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00843
2010-04-22 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703
2010-04-21 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-20 CS/CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 20 NAYS 1 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00703
2010-04-15 Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00600; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 04/20/10, 2:15 pm, 412-K
2010-04-14 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-13 CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00600; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00600
2010-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/13/10, 12:30 pm, 412-K
2010-03-18 Now in Banking and Insurance -SJ 00269
2010-03-17 Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269
2010-03-12 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/10, 3:15 pm, 412-K
2010-03-08 Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00190
2010-03-05 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-04 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00189; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00234
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00024; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/10, 8:00 am, 37-S
2009-12-09 Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2009-10-05 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0123 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 2176 (Ch. 2010-175)
S2176 (Similar To) 2010-06-01 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-175; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 885 (Ch. 2010-61)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00302905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
011218Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0212&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0212.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0212c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0212c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0212c3.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb0212e1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB02120427100007.html

Bill Comments

feedback