FL S0210 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-13)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing August 15, 2018, as "India Independence Day" and August 2018 as "India Heritage Month" in Florida, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

India Independence Day/India Heritage Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateAdopted
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time 786
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-09-22SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-08-23SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H8039 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Adopted by Publication

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback