FL S0206 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Florida Competitive Workforce Act"; adding sexual orientation and gender identity as impermissible grounds for discrimination in public lodging establishments and public food service establishments; providing an exception for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules
2019-08-29SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S34 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
419001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76060Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback