FL S0204 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the specified appropriation for spring restoration, protection, and management projects; requiring a specified appropriation for certain projects related to the St. Johns River and its tributaries or the Keystone Heights Lake Region, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-08HouseIn Messages
2018-02-07SenateCS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/18
2018-01-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-01-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/18/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-07SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-12-07SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2017-11-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 12/07/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2017-10-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
2017-10-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-09SenateCS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 10/09/17, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 09/12/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback