FL S0202 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising student eligibility and ineligibility requirements for the Family Empowerment Scholarship Program; revising student eligibility and ineligibility requirements for the Florida Tax Credit Scholarship Program; revising the eligibility criteria and obligations of private schools participating in certain educational scholarship programs; authorizing public schools, including charter schools, to enroll certain students on a part-time basis, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Education | Sen. Corey Simon [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Sen. Jay Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Education (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-21 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/23 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/16/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 4 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 03/08/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/21/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Chapter No. 2023-16; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245)
H457 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16)
H5101 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-245; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), CS/CS/HB 633 (Ch. 2023-104), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2023-38), CS/CS/SB 240 (Ch. 2023-81)
H457 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16)
H5101 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-245; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/CS/HB 1 (Ch. 2023-16), CS/CS/HB 633 (Ch. 2023-104), CS/HB 1035 (Ch. 2023-38), CS/CS/SB 240 (Ch. 2023-81)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 485 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 499 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 5716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |