FL S0202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increasing the property tax exemption for residents who are widows, widowers, blind, or totally and permanently disabled, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Finance and Tax
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-06SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-05SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/05/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H51 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
196202Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback