FL S0202 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the criteria for involuntary admission for behavioral health services due to substance abuse; revising duties of a law enforcement officer with respect to transporting a person for involuntary admission to a hospital or licensed detoxification or addictions receiving facility or detaining such person in a detention facility for a specified time under certain conditions; requiring a respondent to be released from involuntary substance abuse treatment if the court makes certain determinations regarding the respondent, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health and Substance Abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Health Policy
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations; Rules
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
397675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976772Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976793Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976798Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976957Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397697Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback