FL S0200 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising requirements for athlete agents representing intercollegiate athletes for certain purposes; deleting requirements regarding the compensation that intercollegiate athletes may receive; deleting certain requirements for postsecondary educational institutions whose intercollegiate athletes seek to earn compensation or to have professional representation; requiring a postsecondary educational institution to conduct at least two financial literacy, life skills, and entrepreneurship workshops under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Intercollegiate Athlete Compensation and Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | CS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 02/08/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Rules |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H99 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education & Employment Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |