FL S0200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for e-mail addresses obtained by a tax collector for the purpose of electronically sending certain tax notices or obtaining the consent of a taxpayer for electronic transmission of certain tax notices; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/E-mail Addresses/Tax Notices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#270 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Chapter No. 2015-13 | |
2015-05-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 179 |
2015-04-21 | House | Received |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/15, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0179 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 200 (Ch. 2015-13)