FL S0200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-95
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-95
Summary
Extends from 5 to 7 years the period between parole interview dates for inmates convicted of violating specified provisions or serving a mandatory minimum sentence under a specified provision.
Title
Parole Interview Dates for Certain Inmates [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Chapter No. 2010-95 | |
2010-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01222; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 01222 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01168; Substituted for HB 261 -HJ 01169 | |
2010-04-26 | In Messages; Received -HJ 01095; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01095 | |
2010-04-23 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00757; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00757 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00700 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | -SJ 00152; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00163 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00023; On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/13/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; CS read 1st time on | |
2010-01-28 | Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-01-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-01-13 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-04 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/13/10, 10:00 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-10-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0261 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 200; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 200 (Ch. 2010-95) -HJ 01169
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0947 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0947 | 174 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0947 | 1745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0200&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |