FL S0198 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to the testing and approval of sparklers; repealing provisions relating to the registration of manufacturers, distributors, wholesalers, and retailers of sparklers; prohibiting persons, firms, copartnerships, and corporations from selling fireworks to any person under 18 years of age, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fireworks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-23SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2017-10-23SenateRemaining references corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules
2017-10-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-10-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2017-10-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 10/11/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-09-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 09/14/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-08-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6037 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
791012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
791013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
791015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79106Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback