FL S0198 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the testing and approval of sparklers; repealing provisions relating to the registration of manufacturers, distributors, wholesalers, and retailers of sparklers; prohibiting persons, firms, copartnerships, and corporations from selling fireworks to any person under 18 years of age, etc.
Title
Fireworks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-10-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-10-11 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2017-10-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 10/11/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-09-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 09/14/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6037 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
791 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |