FL S0198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a county governing authority to levy a discretionary sales surtax to fund capital restoration of natural water bodies for public use; limiting expenditures of the proceeds and interest from the surtax or specified bonds pledging the surtax to dredging operations related to ecologically beneficial muck removal, etc.
Title
Local Government Infrastructure Surtax
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1013 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0597 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/198 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0198/BillText/Filed/HTML |